TX HB4635 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-08 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to an optional additional fine for the violation of a municipal rule, ordinance, or police regulation to be used to support municipal parks.
Title
Relating to an optional additional fine for the violation of a municipal rule, ordinance, or police regulation to be used to support municipal parks.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-08 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-08 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-07 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-07 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-16 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-16 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-26 | Referred to Urban Affairs | |
2009-03-26 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks
City Government--General
Environment
Environment--Solid Waste
Parks & Wildlife
Parks & Wildlife--Parks