TX HB462 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-13 - Referred to Jurisprudence
Pending: Senate Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the assignment of special judges in county courts in certain counties.
Title
Relating to the assignment of special judges in county courts in certain counties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-13 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2011-04-13 | Read first time | |
2011-03-31 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-30 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-30 | Record vote | |
2011-03-30 | Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-30 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-03-30 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2011-03-24 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2011-03-15 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-15 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-15 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-07 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-07 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-07 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-02-28 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-02-28 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-02-28 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2010-12-21 | Filed |