TX HB46 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-3)
Status: Introduced on November 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-18 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of raw milk and raw milk products.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of raw milk and raw milk products.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-18HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2013-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2013-04-17HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2013-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2013-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-03-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-03-27HouseVote reconsidered in committee
2013-03-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-03-21HouseFailed to receive affirmative vote in comm.
2013-03-21HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2013-03-21HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2013-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2013-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2013-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2013-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2013-02-04HouseReferred to Public Health
2013-02-04HouseRead first time
2012-11-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback