TX HB455 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-15 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to policies on the recess period in public schools.
Title
Relating to policies on the recess period in public schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Alma Allen [D] | Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Michelle Beckley [D] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. James Talarico [D] | Sen. Kirk Watson [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#376 (Y: 95 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#349 (Y: 106 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#376 (Y: 95 N: 48 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal RV#349 (Y: 106 N: 39 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-15 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-19 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-16 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-16 | House | Record vote RV#376 |
2019-04-16 | House | Passed |
2019-04-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Record vote RV#349 |
2019-04-15 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-04-15 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-04-15 | House | Amended 1-Sanford and Allen |
2019-04-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2019-04-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-13 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-03-12 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-03-11 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-03-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-03-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-02-26 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-02-26 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-12-04 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB364 (Same As) 2019-05-07 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Subjects
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
Education--School Districts
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF