TX HB455 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-23 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the authority of a property owner to participate by telephone conference call at a protest hearing by an appraisal review board.
Title
Relating to the authority of a property owner to participate by telephone conference call at a protest hearing by an appraisal review board.
Sponsors
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Dennis Bonnen [R] | Rep. Jim Murphy [R] | Rep. Mark Keough [R] |
Sen. Robert Nichols [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - Read 3rd time RV#243 (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-15 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-15 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-12 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-11 | House | Senate passage reported |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred to Finance |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-13 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-13 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-13 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-13 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-03-28 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-03-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-22 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-22 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-03-22 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-15 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-15 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-20 | House | Referred to Ways & Means |
2017-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-28 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
TELECONFERENCING
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES
Taxation--Property-Appeal of Tax Decisions
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
TELECONFERENCING
TELEPHONES & TELEPHONE DIRECTORIES