TX HB4532 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-25 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the development and posting by county governments of lists of local mental health resources available to the public.
Title
Relating to the development and posting by county governments of lists of local mental health resources available to the public.
Sponsors
Rep. Todd Hunter [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-12 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-11 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-10 | House | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to County Affairs |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
County Government
County Government--General
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
County Government--General
INTERNET
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
State Finances
State Finances--Appropriations
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4532 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04532I.htm |