TX HB453 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-25 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Pending: House Juvenile Justice & Family Issues Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to protective orders; making conforming changes.
Title
Relating to protective orders; making conforming changes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-10 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to Criminal Justice
HB39 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB3466 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
HB39 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective on 9/1/21
HB3466 (Same As) 2021-03-22 - Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues
Subjects
ATTORNEY GENERAL
Courts
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
CRIME VICTIMS
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Courts
Courts--Prosecuting Attorneys
CRIME VICTIMS
Family
Family--Family Violence
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB453 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB00453I.htm |