TX HB451 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective on 9/1/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of a Don't Mess with Texas Water program to prevent illegal dumping that affects the surface waters of this state.
Title
Relating to the creation of a Don't Mess with Texas Water program to prevent illegal dumping that affects the surface waters of this state.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwayne Bohac [R] | Rep. Daniel Branch [R] | Sen. Charles Creighton [R] | Sen. Glenn Hegar [R] |
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective on 9/1/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-19 | Senate passage reported | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Passed | |
2011-05-19 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-19 | Record vote | |
2011-05-19 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-19 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-19 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-19 | Laid before the Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-11 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-11 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2011-05-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-04-07 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-04-07 | Read first time | |
2011-03-28 | Received from the House | |
2011-03-24 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-03-24 | Record vote | |
2011-03-24 | Passed | |
2011-03-24 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-03-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-03-23 | Record vote | |
2011-03-23 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-03-23 | Amended | |
2011-03-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-14 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-11 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-01 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-01 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-17 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2011-02-17 | Read first time | |
2010-12-20 | Filed |
Subjects
Environment
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Highways
SIGNS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
WATER
Water--General
Environment--Hazardous, Toxic & Nuclear Waste
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
Highways
SIGNS
TRANSPORTATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
WATER
Water--General