TX HB4507 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-04-30 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to federal election practices and procedures.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to federal election practices and procedures.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-30HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-22HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-22HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to State Affairs
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

HB4366 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs
HB4366 (Same As) 2021-03-29 - Referred to State Affairs

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback