TX HB45 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 31-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to requiring the Texas Supreme Court to adopt rules and provide judicial instruction regarding the application of foreign laws in certain family law cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to requiring the Texas Supreme Court to adopt rules and provide judicial instruction regarding the application of foreign laws in certain family law cases.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#920 (Y: 135 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-05 - House - Read 2nd time RV#858 (Y: 127 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Effective on 9/1/17
2017-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2017-05-26 Sent to the Governor
2017-05-26SenateSigned in the Senate
2017-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2017-05-24HouseReported enrolled
2017-05-22HouseSenate passage reported
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenatePassed
2017-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2017-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2017-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2017-05-22SenateRecord vote
2017-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2017-05-21SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2017-05-19SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-18SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2017-05-18SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2017-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2017-05-12SenateReferred to State Affairs
2017-05-12SenateRead first time
2017-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-06HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-06HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-06HouseRecord vote
2017-05-06HousePassed
2017-05-06HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-05HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2017-05-05HouseRecord vote
2017-05-05HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-05HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-04HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-24HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-18HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-04-04HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-04-04HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-04HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-04-04HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-13HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2017-02-13HouseRead first time
2016-11-14HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB45
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00045I.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00045H.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00045E.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00045S.htm
Texthttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB00045F.htm
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB45&RcdVtNo=858&Ch=H&Dt=05/05/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB45&RcdVtNo=920&Ch=H&Dt=05/06/2017
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=2
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/85r/pdf/85RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=3

Bill Comments

feedback