TX HB4480 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-26 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a study on the use of art therapy in public schools and on art therapy in higher education.
Title
Relating to a study on the use of art therapy in public schools and on art therapy in higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-25 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-17 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-26 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-03-26 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Arts & Humanities
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
COUNSELING & THERAPY
Education
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--General
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--General
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4480 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04480I.htm |