TX HB4471 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-11 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to examination fees for the review and approval of public securities and related proceedings and funding for victims assistance and sexual assault prevention services.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to examination fees for the review and approval of public securities and related proceedings and funding for victims assistance and sexual assault prevention services.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-11HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-05-11HouseReturned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
2021-05-11HouseWithdrawn from calendar (contested)
2021-05-11HouseAmended 1-Goldman
2021-05-11HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-11HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2021-05-07HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2021-05-04HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2021-05-03HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-05-03HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-23HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2021-04-23HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2021-04-23HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2021-04-16HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-16HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-16HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-16HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-29HouseReferred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services
2021-03-29HouseRead first time
2021-03-12HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback