TX HB442 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-24 - Placed on intent calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain professions, including the online publication of home addresses of certain occupational license holders.
Title
Relating to the licensing and regulation of certain professions, including the online publication of home addresses of certain occupational license holders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-20 - House - Read 3rd time RV#322 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-04-20 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-20 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-20 | House | Record vote |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-04-20 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-04-20 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-13 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-12 | House | Recommitted to committee |
2017-04-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-10 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-04-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-21 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2017-02-21 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-22 | House | Filed |
Subjects
CHEMICAL DEPENDENCY COUNSELORS
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
LICENSED DYSLEXIA PRACTITIONER & LICENSED DYSLEXIA THERAPIST ADVISORY BOARD
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Open Records
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
Protection of Personal Information
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
EXAMINERS OF PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF
LICENSED DYSLEXIA PRACTITIONER & LICENSED DYSLEXIA THERAPIST ADVISORY BOARD
LICENSING & REGULATION, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Open Records
PROFESSIONAL COUNSELORS
Protection of Personal Information
PSYCHOLOGISTS, TEXAS STATE BOARD OF EXAMINERS OF
SOCIAL WORK & SOCIAL WORKERS
SOCIAL WORKER EXAMINERS, STATE BOARD OF
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF