TX HB440 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-23 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to adapting the public school physical education curriculum to accommodate the needs of students with mental disabilities.
Title
Relating to adapting the public school physical education curriculum to accommodate the needs of students with mental disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Larry Gonzales [R] | Rep. Marisa Marquez [D] | Rep. Ron Simmons [R] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] |
Sen. Kirk Watson [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-09 - House - HB 440Third Reading House (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-23 | Effective immediately | |
2015-05-23 | Signed by the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2015-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2015-05-13 | House | Reported enrolled |
2015-05-13 | House | Senate passage reported |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Passed |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2015-05-13 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2015-05-15 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Education |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Received from the House |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported engrossed |
2015-04-09 | House | Record vote |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 3rd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2015-04-09 | House | Read 2nd time |
2015-04-09 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2015-04-06 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2015-03-11 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2015-03-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2015-03-09 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2015-03-03 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-03-03 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-03-03 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-03-03 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-02-24 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-02-24 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-02-16 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2015-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2014-12-04 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
Education
EDUCATION, STATE BOARD OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Mental Health & Substance Abuse
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety