TX HB4390 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the privacy of personal identifying information and the creation of the Texas Privacy Protection Advisory Council.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the privacy of personal identifying information and the creation of the Texas Privacy Protection Advisory Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-24 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1819 (Y: 138 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2019-05-07 - House - Amendment withdrawn RV#1083 (Y: 140 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - Amended RV#1055 (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 See remarks for effective date
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-26HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-25HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-24SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-24HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2019-05-24HouseRecord vote RV#1819
2019-05-24HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenatePassed
2019-05-22SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-22SenateRecord vote
2019-05-22SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-22SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-22SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-22SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-16SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-16SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-10SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2019-05-10SenateRead first time
2019-05-08SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-07HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1083
2019-05-07HousePassed
2019-05-07HouseAmendment withdrawn 1-Oliverson
2019-05-07HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-07HouseVote reconsidered
2019-05-07HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-07HouseRecord vote RV#1055
2019-05-07HousePassed as amended
2019-05-07HouseAmended 1-Oliverson
2019-05-07HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-06HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2019-05-06HouseAmended 1-Capriglione
2019-05-06HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 11, Section 6(e)
2019-05-06HouseAmendment(s) offered 1-Capriglione
2019-05-06HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-02HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-24HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-04-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-04-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-02HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-02HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-02HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-25HouseReferred to Business & Industry
2019-03-25HouseRead first time
2019-03-08HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4390
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04390I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04390H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04390E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04390S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04390F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4390&RcdVtNo=1055&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4390&RcdVtNo=1083&Ch=H&Dt=05/07/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4390&RcdVtNo=1819&Ch=H&Dt=05/24/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-22-F.PDF#page=19

Bill Comments

feedback