TX HB438 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on December 18 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-10 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the creation of an offense for certain uses of a wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle.
Title
Relating to the creation of an offense for certain uses of a wireless communication device while operating a motor vehicle.
Sponsors
Rep. Eddie Lucio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-10 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-10 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-10 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-02-18 | Referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-18 | Read first time | |
2008-12-18 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB51 (Similar To) 2009-02-10 - Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.