TX HB4365 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-20 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a pilot project to improve health care outcomes and reduce costs under Medicaid by providing participating recipients with enhanced case management and other services to address certain social determinants of health.
Title
Relating to a pilot project to improve health care outcomes and reduce costs under Medicaid by providing participating recipients with enhanced case management and other services to address certain social determinants of health.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Oliverson [R] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Rep. Stephanie Klick [R] | Rep. Rhetta Bowers [D] |
Rep. James White [R] | Rep. Trey Martinez Fischer [D] | Rep. Terry Meza [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB651 (Same As) 2021-03-11 - Referred to Health & Human Services