TX HB436 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-12 - Postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to standing for certain foster parents to file a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to standing for certain foster parents to file a suit affecting the parent-child relationship.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-12 Postponed
2011-05-12 Read 2nd time
2011-05-11 Placed on General State Calendar
2011-05-09 Considered in Calendars
2011-04-27 Committee report sent to Calendars
2011-04-27 Committee report distributed
2011-04-26 Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2011-04-14 Reported favorably as substituted
2011-04-14 Committee substitute considered in committee
2011-04-14 Considered in formal meeting
2011-03-14 Left pending in committee
2011-03-14 Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2011-03-14 Considered in public hearing
2011-03-07 No action taken in committee
2011-03-07 Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
2011-02-16 Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2011-02-16 Read first time
2010-12-15 Filed

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback