TX HB4355 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to a study of alternate ways to assure clinical competency of graduates of nursing educational programs.
Title
Relating to a study of alternate ways to assure clinical competency of graduates of nursing educational programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Veronica Gonzales [D] | Rep. Donna Howard [D] | Rep. Susan King [R] | Rep. Jim Pitts [R] |
Rep. John Zerwas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-30 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-29 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-25 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-03-25 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Subjects
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Health Institutions
NURSES & NURSE AIDES
Occupational Regulation
Occupational Regulation--Health Occupations