TX HB4341 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to increasing criminal penalties for the offense of making a firearm accessible to a child.
Title
Relating to increasing criminal penalties for the offense of making a firearm accessible to a child.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB158 (Same As) 2019-02-01 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Weapons
Criminal Procedure--General
Criminal Procedure--Sentencing & Punishment
Minors
Minors--Crimes Against
Weapons
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB4341 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB04341I.htm |