TX HB434 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 56-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-11 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to eliminating the wrongful birth cause of action.
Title
Relating to eliminating the wrongful birth cause of action.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-09 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Vote reconsidered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-12 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-05 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2017-03-22 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-21 | House | Filed |