TX HB4299 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Laid on the table subject to call
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of Port Neches Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Title
Relating to the creation of Port Neches Improvement District; providing authority to issue bonds; providing authority to impose assessments, fees, or taxes.
Sponsors
Rep. Dade Phelan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Laid on the table subject to call |
2017-05-19 | House | Companion considered in lieu of |
2017-05-19 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2017-05-16 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2017-05-05 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2017-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-05 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-05-05 | House | Recommendations filed with the Speaker |
2017-05-04 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-05-04 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2017-05-04 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-20 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Special Purpose Districts |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-29 | House | Transmitted to the Governor |
2017-03-29 | House | Filed |
Subjects
PORT NECHES IMPROVEMENT DISTRICT
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=85R&Bill=HB4299 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/85R/billtext/html/HB04299I.htm |