TX HB4299 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Status: Engrossed on May 14 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-26 - Placed on intent calendar
Summary
Relating to rainwater harvesting and other water conservation initiatives.
Title
Relating to rainwater harvesting and other water conservation initiatives.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-26 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-23 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-23 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-21 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-18 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-05-18 | Read first time | |
2009-05-15 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-14 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-14 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-14 | Record vote | |
2009-05-14 | Passed | |
2009-05-14 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-13 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-13 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-13 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-13 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-21 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-20 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-20 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-09 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-09 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-09 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-03-31 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-03-31 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Meeting cancelled | |
2009-03-31 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-24 | Referred to Natural Resources | |
2009-03-24 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
HJR74 (Enabling for) 2009-03-04 - Referred to Ways & Means
Subjects
BUILDING CONSTRUCTION
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
PERMITS
PROPERTY OWNERS' & HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATIONS
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
WATER--CONSERVATION
City Government
City Government--General
County Government
County Government--General
Environment
Environment--Water
ENVIRONMENTAL QUALITY, TEXAS COMMISSION ON
FACILITIES COMMISSION, TEXAS
PERMITS
PROPERTY OWNERS' & HOMEOWNERS' ASSOCIATIONS
Public Lands, Buildings & Resources
WATER
WATER DEVELOPMENT BOARD
WATER--CONSERVATION