TX HB429 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 30 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-16 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Public Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the state virtual school network and a study on digital learning.
Title
Relating to the state virtual school network and a study on digital learning.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-16 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Public Education |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-30 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2244 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Referred to Public Education
Subjects
DISTANCE EDUCATION
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Education
EDUCATION AGENCY, TEXAS
EDUCATION, COMMISSIONER OF
Education--Primary & Secondary
Education--Primary & Secondary--Admission & Attendance
Education--Primary & Secondary--Curriculum
Electronic Information Systems
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB429 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00429I.htm |