TX HB429 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the definition of rural area for purposes of certain housing assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Title
Relating to the definition of rural area for purposes of certain housing assistance administered by the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-24 - House - HB 429Third Reading House (Y: 142 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - HB 429Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - HB 429Third Reading House (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-14 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-06-14 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-26 | House | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-26 | House | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-25 | Senate | Senate adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported |
2013-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-24 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-24 | House | House adopts conference committee report |
2013-05-22 | House | Conf. Comm. Report distributed |
2013-05-22 | Senate | Conference committee report filed |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-21 | House | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate appoints conferees |
2013-05-21 | Senate | Senate grants request for conference comm. |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House appoints conferees-reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House requests conference committee-reported |
2013-05-20 | Senate | House refuses to concur-reported |
2013-05-20 | House | House appoints conferees |
2013-05-20 | House | House requests conference committee |
2013-05-20 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2013-05-17 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2013-05-15 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Amended |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-15 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2013-05-10 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-05-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Intergovernmental Relations |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2013-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | Record vote |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2013-04-25 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-04-25 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2013-04-22 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2013-04-08 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2013-04-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-04-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-03-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-03-27 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2013-03-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2013-03-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-03-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-02-11 | House | Referred to Urban Affairs |
2013-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2013-01-10 | House | Filed |