TX HB4241 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-09 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to measures to ensure certain adopted students are informed regarding their eligibility for tuition and fee exemptions at certain institutions of higher education.
Title
Relating to measures to ensure certain adopted students are informed regarding their eligibility for tuition and fee exemptions at certain institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-06 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-02 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-02 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-19 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Higher Education |
2017-04-04 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
ADOPTION
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS
Education
Education--Higher
Education--Higher--Student Fees
Education--Higher--Student Financial Aid
Education--Higher--Tuition
HIGHER EDUCATION COORDINATING BOARD, TEXAS