TX HB423 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 5 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the computation of cost of goods sold for purposes of the franchise tax by taxable entities that transport ready-mixed concrete.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the computation of cost of goods sold for purposes of the franchise tax by taxable entities that transport ready-mixed concrete.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#814 (Y: 128 N: 18 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19SenateLeft pending in committee
2017-05-19SenateTestimony taken in committee
2017-05-19SenateConsidered in public hearing
2017-05-19SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-05-18SenatePosting rule suspended
2017-05-05SenateReferred to Finance
2017-05-05SenateRead first time
2017-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2017-05-05HouseReported engrossed
2017-05-04HouseRecord vote
2017-05-04HousePassed
2017-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2017-05-03HousePassed to engrossment
2017-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2017-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2017-05-01HouseConsidered in Calendars
2017-04-27HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-04-26HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-04-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-19HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-19HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-19HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-02-16HouseReferred to Ways & Means
2017-02-16HouseRead first time
2016-11-21HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback