TX HB422 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-21 - Reported engrossed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to annual reporting regarding the establishment of certain school district planning and decision-making committees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to annual reporting regarding the establishment of certain school district planning and decision-making committees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - House - Read 3rd time RV#71 (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - Read 2nd time RV#66 (Y: 144 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-21HouseReported engrossed
2019-03-21HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-21HouseRecord vote RV#71
2019-03-21HousePassed
2019-03-21HouseRead 3rd time
2019-03-20HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-03-20HouseRecord vote RV#66
2019-03-20HousePassed to engrossment
2019-03-20HouseRead 2nd time
2019-03-20HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-03-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-12HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-11HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-06HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-03-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-26HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-26HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-26HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-26HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Public Education
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-11-29HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback