TX HB421 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 29 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-10 - Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the designation of the portion of Interstate Highway 14 in Bell County as the First Cavalry Veterans Highway.
Title
Relating to the designation of the portion of Interstate Highway 14 in Bell County as the First Cavalry Veterans Highway.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | House | Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm. |
2019-05-10 | House | Withdrawn from calendar (by author) |
2019-05-10 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-16 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-16 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-15 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-02-20 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-20 | House | Read first time |
2018-11-29 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB2156 (Same As) 2019-06-10 - Effective on 9/1/19