TX HB421 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 49-0)
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-03 - Considered in Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to an exemption from application of the Private Security Act for volunteer security services provided at a place of religious worship.
Title
Relating to an exemption from application of the Private Security Act for volunteer security services provided at a place of religious worship.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-03 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-07 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-03-28 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-28 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-03-28 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-03-07 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-07 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to Homeland Security & Public Safety |
2017-02-16 | House | Read first time |
2016-11-21 | House | Filed |