TX HB4181 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the organization and efficient operation of the legislative branch of state government.
Title
Relating to the organization and efficient operation of the legislative branch of state government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1783 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#963 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#963 (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-14 | Effective immediately | |
2019-06-14 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-26 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 189 |
2019-05-26 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction HCR 189 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2019-05-23 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2019-05-23 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-23 | House | Record vote RV#1783 |
2019-05-23 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amended |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Hancock |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-05-03 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | House | Record vote RV#963 |
2019-05-03 | House | Passed |
2019-05-03 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-02 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2019-05-02 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 5-C. Turner |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 4-Capriglione |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 3-Geren |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 2-Geren |
2019-05-02 | House | Amended 1-Geren |
2019-05-02 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/2/19 9:00 AM |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/1/19 4:00 PM |
2019-05-01 | House | Laid out as postponed business |
2019-05-01 | House | Postponed 5/1/19 3:00 PM |
2019-05-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-01 | House | Placed on Major State Calendar |
2019-04-29 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2019-04-29 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2019-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-24 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2019-04-24 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2019-04-24 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to House Administration |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Open Records
SECRETARY OF STATE
SENATE, TEXAS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES
LEGISLATIVE BUDGET BOARD
LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL, TEXAS
LEGISLATIVE REFERENCE LIBRARY
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Open Records
SECRETARY OF STATE
SENATE, TEXAS
SPEAKER OF THE HOUSE
STATE LIBRARY & ARCHIVES COMMISSION, TEXAS