TX HB4173 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the nonsubstantive revision of certain provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure, including conforming amendments.
Title
Relating to the nonsubstantive revision of certain provisions of the Code of Criminal Procedure, including conforming amendments.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-26 - House - Read 3rd time RV#752 (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . . January 1, 2021 | |
2019-06-07 | Filed without the Governor's signature | |
2019-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-21 | House | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-21 | House | Senate passage reported |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Passed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Received from the House |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported engrossed |
2019-04-26 | House | Record vote RV#752 |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2019-04-26 | House | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-26 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-04-23 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-04-17 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-04-16 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-04-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-04-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-04-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-04-08 | House | Left pending in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2019-04-08 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2019-04-08 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-25 | House | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time |
2019-03-08 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--Juries
CRIME VICTIMS
Crime Victims Compensation
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Health
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
Protection of Personal Information
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Statutory Revision
WITNESSES
Courts--Juries
CRIME VICTIMS
Crime Victims Compensation
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
Health
Health--Privacy/Use of Information
Protection of Personal Information
PROTECTIVE ORDERS
Statutory Revision
WITNESSES