TX HB4102 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on June 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-15 - Effective on 9/1/17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to establishing and funding a grant program for testing evidence collected in relation to sexual assaults or other sex offenses; authorizing voluntary contributions.
Title
Relating to establishing and funding a grant program for testing evidence collected in relation to sexual assaults or other sex offenses; authorizing voluntary contributions.
Sponsors
Rep. Victoria Neave Criado [D] | Rep. Mary Gonzalez [D] | Rep. Jason Villalba [R] | Rep. Ina Minjarez [D] |
Sen. Cesar Blanco [D] | Rep. Diana Arevalo [D] | Rep. Toni Rose [D] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-26 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1864 (Y: 140 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - FA1 West (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-24 - Senate - FA1 West (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-06 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 142 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | Effective on 9/1/17 | |
2017-06-15 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-29 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Senate adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2017-05-28 | House | House adopts resolution for tech. correction |
2017-05-26 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-26 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-26 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-26 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-26 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-25 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-24 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-24 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-05-06 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-05-06 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-06 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-06 | House | Passed |
2017-05-06 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-05 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2017-05-05 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-04 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-02 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-04-28 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-04-27 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-17 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-31 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-03-31 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
BLOOD & MEDICAL TESTS
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
EVIDENCE
Law Enforcement
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration
COUNTY TAX ASSESSOR-COLLECTORS
Crimes
Crimes--Against Persons
Crimes--Against Persons--Sexual
CRIMINAL JUSTICE DIVISION, GOVERNOR'S OFFICE
EVIDENCE
Law Enforcement
MOTOR VEHICLES, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
SEXUAL ASSAULT
Vehicles & Traffic
Vehicles & Traffic--Vehicle Registration