TX HB410 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the regulation of certain low-volume and other livestock processing establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the regulation of certain low-volume and other livestock processing establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-26 - Senate - Senate adopts conference committee report (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-26 - House - House adopts conference committee report RV#1964 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - Read 3rd time RV#252 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - Read 2nd time RV#228 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-29 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-27SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-27HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-26HouseReported enrolled
2019-05-26SenateHouse adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26HouseRecord vote RV#1964
2019-05-26HouseHouse adopts conference committee report
2019-05-26HouseSenate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
2019-05-26SenateRecord vote
2019-05-26SenateSenate adopts conference committee report
2019-05-25HouseConf. Comm. Report distributed
2019-05-25SenateConference committee report filed
2019-05-24HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-24HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2019-05-24SenateSenate appoints conferees
2019-05-24SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2019-05-23SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2019-05-23SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2019-05-23HouseHouse appoints conferees
2019-05-23HouseHouse requests conference committee
2019-05-23HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2019-05-22HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2019-05-21HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenatePassed
2019-05-21SenateRead 3rd time
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-05-21SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2019-05-21SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-05-21SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-05-20SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-05-20SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-05-17SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-05-17SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-05-17SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-05-17SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2019-04-17SenateReferred to Health & Human Services
2019-04-17SenateRead first time
2019-04-11SenateReceived from the House
2019-04-10HouseReported engrossed
2019-04-10HouseRecord vote RV#252
2019-04-10HousePassed
2019-04-10HouseRead 3rd time
2019-04-09HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-04-09HouseRecord vote RV#228
2019-04-09HousePassed to engrossment
2019-04-09HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-09HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-05HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-02HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-03-26HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-03-25HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-03-25HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-03-18HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-18HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-03-18HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-02-27HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-02-27HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-02-27HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-02-27HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-20HouseReferred to Public Health
2019-02-20HouseRead first time
2018-11-27HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB410
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00410I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00410H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00410E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00410S.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/HB00410F.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB410&RcdVtNo=228&Ch=H&Dt=04/09/2019
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB410&RcdVtNo=252&Ch=H&Dt=04/10/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-21-F.PDF#page=130
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=HB410&RcdVtNo=1964&Ch=H&Dt=05/26/2019
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/86r/pdf/86RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=17

Bill Comments

feedback