TX HB4096 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-20 - Left pending in subcommittee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to purchase of distilled spirits by the holder of a local distributors permit.
Title
Relating to purchase of distilled spirits by the holder of a local distributors permit.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Left pending in subcommittee |
2023-04-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee |
2023-04-20 | House | Considered by s/c in public hearing |
2023-04-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . . |
2023-04-12 | House | Referred directly to subcommittee by chair |
2023-03-20 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2023-03-20 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-08 | House | Filed |