TX HB4094 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 11 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-26 - Removed from local & uncontested calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to certain procurements by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Title
Relating to certain procurements by the Department of Family and Protective Services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-11 - House - Read 3rd time RV#951 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-26 | Senate | Removed from local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-05-12 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-05-11 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Record vote RV#951 |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal |
2021-05-11 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-05-11 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-05-11 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2021-05-07 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2021-04-23 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-16 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-04-16 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2021-04-16 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-16 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-04-13 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-13 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-13 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-29 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2021-03-29 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-12 | House | Filed |
Subjects
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State
Human Services
Human Services--General
Purchasing
Purchasing--State