TX HB409 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 28 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-10 - Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
Pending: Senate Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to waivers for entrance fees to state parks and certain hunting and fishing license fees for resident first responders.
Title
Relating to waivers for entrance fees to state parks and certain hunting and fishing license fees for resident first responders.
Sponsors
Rep. Philip Cortez [D] | Rep. Leo Pacheco [D] | Rep. Ryan Guillen [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Campos [D] |
Rep. Ray Lopez [D] | Rep. Ana-Maria Ramos [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#490 (Y: 134 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-10 | Senate | Referred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs |
2021-05-10 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-04-28 | Senate | Received from the House |
2021-04-28 | House | Reported engrossed |
2021-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#490 |
2021-04-28 | House | Passed |
2021-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Passed to engrossment |
2021-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2021-04-27 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2021-04-23 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2021-04-13 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2021-04-06 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2021-04-06 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2021-03-29 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-03-29 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-29 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2021-02-25 | House | Read first time |
2020-11-09 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Disabilities, Persons with
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue
Fees & Other Nontax Revenue--State
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Parks & Wildlife
PARKS & WILDLIFE COMMISSION
PARKS & WILDLIFE DEPARTMENT
Parks & Wildlife--Hunting & Fishing
Parks & Wildlife--Licenses