TX HB4072 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Status: Introduced on March 13 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-29 - Left pending in committee
Summary
Relating to the designation of certain areas as banking development districts to encourage the establishment of financial institution branches in those areas.
Title
Relating to the designation of certain areas as banking development districts to encourage the establishment of financial institution branches in those areas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-13 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB825 (Same As) 2009-05-23 - Not again placed on intent calendar
Subjects
FINANCE COMMISSION OF TEXAS
Financial
Financial--Banks
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous
Financial
Financial--Banks
Special Districts & Authorities
Special Districts & Authorities--Miscellaneous