TX HB4059 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-18 - Effective immediately
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to limitations on annexation by and extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain municipalities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to limitations on annexation by and extraterritorial jurisdiction of certain municipalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-05-29 - House - HB 4059Third Reading House (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - House - HB 4059Third Reading House (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-18 Effective immediately
2015-06-18 Signed by the Governor
2015-06-01 Sent to the Governor
2015-06-01SenateSigned in the Senate
2015-05-31HouseSigned in the House
2015-05-30HouseReported enrolled
2015-05-29SenateHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
2015-05-29HouseText of Senate Amendment(s)
2015-05-29HouseRecord vote
2015-05-29HouseHouse concurs in Senate amendment(s)
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2015-05-28HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2015-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenatePassed
2015-05-27SenateRead 3rd time
2015-05-27SenateRecord vote
2015-05-27SenateThree day rule suspended
2015-05-27SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-27SenateRead 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
2015-05-27SenateLaid before the Senate
2015-05-27SenatePlaced on local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-24SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2015-05-24SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2015-05-24SenateReported favorably as substituted
2015-05-21SenateTestimony taken in committee
2015-05-21SenateConsidered in public hearing
2015-05-21SenateVote recorded in Journal
2015-05-21SenatePosting rule suspended
2015-05-13SenateReferred to Intergovernmental Relations
2015-05-13SenateRead first time
2015-05-13SenateReceived from the House
2015-05-12HouseReported engrossed
2015-05-12HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2015-05-12HouseRecord vote
2015-05-12HousePassed
2015-05-12HouseRead 3rd time
2015-05-12HousePassed to engrossment
2015-05-12HouseRead 2nd time
2015-05-12HousePlaced on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
2015-05-08HouseConsidered in Local & Consent Calendars
2015-05-01HouseComm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
2015-05-01HouseCommittee report distributed
2015-04-30HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2015-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2015-04-29HouseRecommended to be sent to Local & Consent
2015-04-29HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2015-04-29HouseScheduled for formal meeting on . . .
2015-04-28HouseLeft pending in committee
2015-04-28HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2015-04-28HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2015-04-28HouseConsidered in public hearing
2015-04-28HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2015-03-24HouseReferred to Urban Affairs
2015-03-24HouseRead first time
2015-03-13HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback