TX HB4056 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-12 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Summary
Relating to the establishment of a program for the collection, transportation, recycling, and disposal of mercury-added thermostats.
Title
Relating to the establishment of a program for the collection, transportation, recycling, and disposal of mercury-added thermostats.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-12 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-11 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-11 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-04 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-04 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-05-04 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-04-29 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-29 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Environmental Regulation | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |