TX HB404 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2016 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-05-04 - Committee report sent to Calendars
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to higher education curriculum review teams to review public school curriculum standards for college readiness purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to higher education curriculum review teams to review public school curriculum standards for college readiness purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2017-05-04HouseCommittee report distributed
2017-05-04HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2017-04-12HouseReported favorably as substituted
2017-04-12HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-04-12HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2017-03-14HouseLeft pending in committee
2017-03-14HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2017-03-14HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2017-03-14HouseConsidered in public hearing
2017-03-14HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2017-03-06HouseReferred to Public Education
2017-03-06HouseCorrection in referral
2017-02-20HouseReferred to Higher Education
2017-02-20HouseRead first time
2016-11-17HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback