TX HB4003 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Referred to Higher Education
Pending: Senate Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board concerning a shortage of primary care physicians in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to a study by the Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board concerning a shortage of primary care physicians in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-03 - House - Read 3rd time RV#988 (Y: 118 N: 22 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-05-02 - House - Read 2nd time RV#948 (Y: 114 N: 19 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07SenateReferred to Higher Education
2019-05-07SenateRead first time
2019-05-06SenateReceived from the House
2019-05-03HouseReported engrossed
2019-05-03HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-03HouseRecord vote RV#988
2019-05-03HousePassed
2019-05-03HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-02HouseStatement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
2019-05-02HouseRecord vote RV#948
2019-05-02HousePassed to engrossment
2019-05-02HouseRead 2nd time
2019-04-30HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-04-26HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-04-17HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-04-16HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-15HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-15HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-04-10HouseLeft pending in committee
2019-04-10HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2019-04-10HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-10HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Higher Education
2019-03-21HouseRead first time
2019-03-07HouseFiled

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback