TX HB4 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-24)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 58-24)
Status: Passed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - See remarks for effective date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the relative or other designated caregiver placement program and to monetary assistance provided by the Department of Family and Protective Services to certain relative or designated caregivers; creating a criminal offense; creating a civil penalty.
Title
Relating to the relative or other designated caregiver placement program and to monetary assistance provided by the Department of Family and Protective Services to certain relative or designated caregivers; creating a criminal offense; creating a civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - House - House concurs in Senate amendment(s) RV#1819 (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#58 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment as amended withdrawn RV#55 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment amended RV#54 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#53 (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment as amended tabled RV#52 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#45 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-22 - Senate - Amendment adopted as amended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Read 3rd time RV#58 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment as amended withdrawn RV#55 (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment amended RV#54 (Y: 79 N: 62 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment tabled RV#53 (Y: 86 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - Amendment as amended tabled RV#52 (Y: 88 N: 57 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - Calendars Committee rule adopted RV#45 (Y: 143 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-31 | See remarks for effective date | |
2017-05-31 | Signed by the Governor | |
2017-05-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2017-05-29 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2017-05-28 | House | Signed in the House |
2017-05-27 | House | Reported enrolled |
2017-05-25 | Senate | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported |
2017-05-25 | House | Text of Senate Amendment(s) |
2017-05-25 | House | Record vote |
2017-05-25 | House | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed |
2017-05-23 | House | Senate Amendments distributed |
2017-05-22 | House | Senate passage as amended reported |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amended |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Co-sponsor authorized |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Read first time |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Received from the House |
2017-03-02 | House | Reported engrossed |
2017-03-02 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-02 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-02 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-02 | House | Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Read 3rd time |
2017-03-01 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Passed to engrossment as amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment as amended withdrawn |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Point of order overruled (amendment) |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment to amendment offered |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-01 | House | Amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment tabled |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-01 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2017-03-01 | House | Record vote |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment as amended tabled |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment withdrawn |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment adopted as amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Amendment(s) offered |
2017-03-01 | House | Amended |
2017-03-01 | House | Read 2nd time |
2017-02-27 | House | Record vote |
2017-02-27 | House | Calendars Committee rule adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on Emergency Calendar |
2017-02-22 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-02-22 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-02-22 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-02-20 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2017-02-20 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-02-20 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-02-13 | House | Read first time |
2017-02-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FRAUD
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
FRAUD
Human Services
Human Services--Child Services