TX HB3983 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Status: Vetoed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Vetoed by the Governor
Summary
Relating to the imposition of property taxes on the residential homesteads of low-income and moderate-income persons.
Title
Relating to the imposition of property taxes on the residential homesteads of low-income and moderate-income persons.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | House adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported | |
2009-05-31 | Record vote | |
2009-05-31 | Senate adopts conference committee report | |
2009-05-30 | Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-30 | Conference committee report filed | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conf comm-reported | |
2009-05-29 | Senate appoints conferees | |
2009-05-29 | Senate grants request for conference comm. | |
2009-05-26 | House appoints conferees-reported | |
2009-05-26 | House requests conference committee-reported | |
2009-05-26 | House refuses to concur-reported | |
2009-05-25 | House appoints conferees | |
2009-05-25 | House requests conference committee | |
2009-05-25 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2009-05-23 | Senate Amendments printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2009-05-22 | Record vote | |
2009-05-22 | Passed | |
2009-05-22 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-22 | Record vote | |
2009-05-22 | Three day rule suspended | |
2009-05-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-22 | Passed to 3rd reading as amended | |
2009-05-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-22 | Amended | |
2009-05-22 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-22 | Amended | |
2009-05-22 | Point of order withdrawn | |
2009-05-22 | Point of order | |
2009-05-22 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-22 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-21 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-21 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-05-18 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-18 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-18 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-05-08 | Referred to Economic Development | |
2009-05-08 | Read first time | |
2009-05-07 | Received from the House | |
2009-05-06 | Reported engrossed | |
2009-05-06 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-06 | Record vote | |
2009-05-06 | Passed | |
2009-05-06 | Read 3rd time | |
2009-05-05 | Passed to engrossment | |
2009-05-05 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-04 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-02 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-04-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-04-28 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-27 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-22 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-08 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-08 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |
Subjects
City Government
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--County
City Government--Land Use & Zoning
County Government
County Government--Land Use & Zoning
Property Interests
Property Interests--Homestead
REINVESTMENT ZONES
Taxation
Taxation--County