TX HB3982 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-10 - Placed on General State Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the Medicaid program, including the administration and operation of the Medicaid managed care program.
Title
Relating to the Medicaid program, including the administration and operation of the Medicaid managed care program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2017-05-08 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2017-05-03 | House | Committee report distributed |
2017-05-03 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-04-27 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-27 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2017-04-10 | House | Left pending in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2017-04-10 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2017-04-10 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-04-03 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2017-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2017-03-10 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Electronic Information Systems
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
INSPECTOR GENERAL FOR HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES
Insurance
Insurance--Health & Accident
MANAGED CARE
MEDICAID