TX HB397 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the creation of the Bureau for Economic Development of the Border Region.
Title
Relating to the creation of the Bureau for Economic Development of the Border Region.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2011-05-26 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-25 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-24 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-24 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported | |
2011-05-23 | Text of Senate Amendment(s) | |
2011-05-23 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-23 | Record vote | |
2011-05-23 | House concurs in Senate amendment(s) | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments Analysis distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate Amendments distributed | |
2011-05-21 | Senate passage as amended reported | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Amended | |
2011-05-21 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-21 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-21 | Co-sponsor authorized | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-16 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-16 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2011-05-16 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-13 | Posting rule suspended | |
2011-05-03 | Referred to International Relations and Trade | |
2011-05-03 | Read first time | |
2011-05-03 | Received from the House | |
2011-04-29 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-04-29 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-29 | Record vote | |
2011-04-29 | Passed | |
2011-04-29 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Passed to engrossment | |
2011-04-28 | Vote reconsidered | |
2011-04-28 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-04-28 | Record vote | |
2011-04-28 | Failed to pass to engrossment | |
2011-04-28 | Laid out as postponed business | |
2011-04-26 | Postponed | |
2011-04-26 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-04-21 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2011-04-19 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-04-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-03-23 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-03-22 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-03-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-03-21 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-21 | Vote reconsidered in committee | |
2011-03-21 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-03-14 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2011-03-14 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2011-03-14 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-03-14 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | |
2011-02-16 | Read first time | |
2010-12-08 | Filed |
Subjects
BORDER
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BORDER REGION, BUREAU FOR
Business & Commerce
Business & Commerce--General
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT OF THE BORDER REGION, BUREAU FOR