TX HB3967 | 2015-2016 | 84th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-11 - Reported favorably as substituted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to a pilot program to increase the financial independence of foster children who are transitioning to independent living.
Title
Relating to a pilot program to increase the financial independence of foster children who are transitioning to independent living.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Reported favorably as substituted |
2015-05-11 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2015-05-11 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-11 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2015-05-06 | House | Left pending in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2015-05-06 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2015-05-06 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to Juvenile Justice & Family Issues |
2015-03-23 | House | Read first time |
2015-03-13 | House | Filed |
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Financial
Financial--Credit Unions
Financial--General
FOSTER CARE
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Financial
Financial--Credit Unions
Financial--General
FOSTER CARE
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=84R&Bill=HB3967 |
Text | http://www.legis.state.tx.us/tlodocs/84R/billtext/html/HB03967I.htm |