TX HB3965 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Status: Introduced on March 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-13 - Placed on General State Calendar
Summary
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation for certain property used to control pollution.
Title
Relating to the exemption from ad valorem taxation for certain property used to control pollution.
Sponsors
Rep. Jim Dunnam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Placed on General State Calendar | |
2009-05-11 | Considered in Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-06 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-05 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-04-29 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2009-04-29 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-29 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Left pending in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Committee substitute considered in committee | |
2009-04-22 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-22 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-23 | Referred to Ways & Means | |
2009-03-23 | Read first time | |
2009-03-12 | Filed |