TX HB3948 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-29 - Senate appoints conferees-reported
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to the production and regulation of hemp and consumable hemp products; providing administrative penalties; creating a criminal offense.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to the production and regulation of hemp and consumable hemp products; providing administrative penalties; creating a criminal offense.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-26 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 0 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-05-26 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-04 - House - Read 3rd time RV#663 (Y: 132 N: 13 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-29HouseSenate appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-29HouseSenate grants request for conf comm-reported
2021-05-28SenateSenate appoints conferees
2021-05-28SenateSenate grants request for conference comm.
2021-05-28SenateHouse appoints conferees-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse requests conference committee-reported
2021-05-28SenateHouse refuses to concur-reported
2021-05-28HouseHouse appoints conferees
2021-05-28HouseHouse requests conference committee
2021-05-28HouseHouse refuses to concur in Senate amendments
2021-05-28HousePoint of order overruled Rule 11, Section 2
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments Analysis distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate Amendments distributed
2021-05-27HouseSenate passage as amended reported
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenatePassed
2021-05-26SenateRead 3rd time
2021-05-26SenateRecord vote
2021-05-26SenateThree day rule suspended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenatePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA2 Perry
2021-05-26SenateVote recorded in Journal
2021-05-26SenateAmended
2021-05-26SenateAmendment(s) offered FA1 Perry
2021-05-26SenateRead 2nd time
2021-05-26SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2021-05-24SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2021-05-21SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2021-05-21SenateReported favorably as substituted
2021-05-20SenateCo-sponsor authorized
2021-05-18SenateTestimony taken in committee
2021-05-18SenateConsidered in public hearing
2021-05-18SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-05-14SenateReferred to Water, Agriculture, & Rural Affairs
2021-05-14SenateRereferred to committee
2021-05-13SenateReferred to Business & Commerce
2021-05-13SenateRead first time
2021-05-05SenateReceived from the House
2021-05-04HouseReported engrossed
2021-05-04HouseRecord vote RV#663
2021-05-04HousePassed
2021-05-04HouseRead 3rd time
2021-05-03HouseNonrecord vote recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HousePassed to engrossment as amended
2021-05-03HouseAmended 1-Beckley
2021-05-03HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2021-05-03HouseRead 2nd time
2021-05-03HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2021-04-30HouseConsidered in Calendars
2021-04-23HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2021-04-22HouseCommittee report distributed
2021-04-22HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2021-04-15HouseReported favorably as substituted
2021-04-15HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-15HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseLeft pending in committee
2021-04-08HouseTestimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
2021-04-08HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2021-04-08HouseConsidered in public hearing
2021-04-08HouseScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2021-03-24HouseReferred to Agriculture & Livestock
2021-03-24HouseRead first time
2021-03-11HouseFiled

Same As/Similar To

SB1778 (Same As) 2021-03-26 - Referred to Business & Commerce

Subjects


Texas State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3948
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03948I.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03948H.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03948E.htm
Texthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/billtext/html/HB03948S.htm
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03948H21.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03948S2F1.HTM
Amendmenthttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/amendments/html/HB03948S2F2.HTM
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03948I.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03948H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03948H.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03948E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03948E.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/fiscalnotes/html/HB03948S.htm
Supplementhttps://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/87R/analysis/html/HB03948S.htm
Roll Callhttps://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/RecordVote.aspx?LegSess=87R&Bill=HB3948&RcdVtNo=663&Ch=H&Dt=05/04/2021
Roll Callhttp://www.journals.senate.state.tx.us/sjrnl/87r/pdf/87RSJ05-26-F.PDF#page=17

Bill Comments

feedback