TX HB3946 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-14 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House Licensing & Administrative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to prohibited relationships between holders of certain alcoholic beverage licenses and permits.
Title
Relating to prohibited relationships between holders of certain alcoholic beverage licenses and permits.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | House | Left pending in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Committee substitute considered in committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2021-04-14 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-24 | House | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures |
2021-03-24 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-11 | House | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB196 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
SB196 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures
SB196 (Similar To) 2021-04-06 - Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures